EP3022682 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HISTOGRAM COMPUTATION USING A GRAPHICS PROCESSING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A2Zlogix, Inc. 26 Mayfield Avenue Edison NJ 08837 / US | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADDY, William L. 433 Raymondskill Road Milford, PA 18337 / US | 02 /
SERAN, Vidhya 1013 Cowboys Parkway Irving, TX 75063 / US | 03 /
NOWALK, Stephen 14220 Caroline Drive North Huntington, PA 15642 / US | 04 /
LIU, Yong 15 Dolores Drive Edison, NJ 08817 / US | 05 /
RAMANATHAN, Childambaram 53 Champlain Road Monmouth Junction, NJ 08852 / US | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 13889560.2 | 17.07.2013 | [2016/21] | WO2013US50870 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015009294 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3022682 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T15/00 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
G06T1/60 (EP);
G06T15/005 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HISTOGRAMMBERECHNUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER GRAFIKVERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT | [2016/21] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HISTOGRAM COMPUTATION USING A GRAPHICS PROCESSING UNIT | [2016/21] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL D'HISTOGRAMME À L'AIDE D'UNE UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT GRAPHIQUE | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 09.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010091018 (TATARCHUK NATALYA A [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] *; | [A]US2008170079 (RAMSHAW CLIFF [GB]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2011116723 (RASMUSSON JIM [SE], et al); | [A]US2007127814 (FLUCK OLIVER [US], et al); | [A]US2002180741 (FOWLER MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2003142099 (DEERING MICHAEL F [US], et al); | [A]US2009256849 (BOLAND MICHELE B [US], et al); | [A]US2003169265 (EMBERLING BRIAN D [US]) | [Y] - SHALOM ET AL., "Efficient k-means clustering using accelerated graphics processors.", DATA WAREHOUSING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY., BERLIN HEIDELBERG, (2008), pages 166 - 175, URL: http://researchweb.iiit.ac.in/-wasif.mpg08/fulltext.pdf, (20131230), XP019104249 | [Y] - EXNER ET AL., "Fast and robust CAMShift tracking.", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION WORKSHOPS (CVPRW), 2010 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON., (2010), page 13, URL: http:l/ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpl/login.jsp?tp=&arnumber=5543787&url=http%3A%2F%2Fieeexplor e.ieee.org%2Fxpls%2Fabs_all.jsp%3Farnumber%3D5543787, (20131230), XP031728969 | [A] - COSSELL, STEPHEN ET AL., "Parallel Evaluation of a Spatial Traversability Cost Function on GPU for Efficient Path Planning.", JOURNAL OF INTELLIGENT LEARNING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, vol. 3.04, (2011), pages 191 - 200, URL: scirp.org/JILSA20110400008_85182034.pdf, (20131230), XP055284701 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4236/jilsa.2011.34022 | [A] - JONSSON, KARL., "Shader-based stereo matching with local algorithms.", THESE DE DOCTORAT, UNIVERSIT? DE LUND, SUEDE, (2003), URL: http://fileadmin.cs.lth.se/graphics/theses/projects/shaderstereo/flles/Report.pdf, (20131230), XP055284703 | [A] - FLUCK, OLIVER ET AL., "GPU histogram computation.", ACM SIGGRAPH 2006 RESEARCH POSTERS., (2006), URL: http://dl.acm.org/citation.cfm?id=1179683, (20131230), XP055284705 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1179622.1179683 |