EP3025882 - AMPHIBIOUS UNICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangdong Hua'chan Research Institute of Intelligent Transportation System Co., Ltd. Room C101-C-103, C-105 Xing'he Ming'Yuan C Building Dong'tang Community, Sha'jing Street Bao'an District, Shenzhen City Guangdong Province / CN | [2019/17] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states Shenzhen Zhiyou Battery Integration Technology Co., Ltd. A5 Building, A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park, Buchong Shajing Street Baoan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Shugang Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 02 /
FU, Bo Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 03 /
PENG, Lei Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 04 /
XU, Yiguo Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Yun Building A5 A-5 Zone Tongfuyu Industrial Park Buchong, Shajing Street, Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518104 / CN | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Drottninggatan 33, plan 4 111 51 Stockholm / SE | [2019/49] |
Former [2016/22] | Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13890232.5 | 24.07.2013 | [2016/22] | WO2013CN80043 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015010288 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3025882 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3025882 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60F3/00, B63H5/02 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
B60F3/0084 (EP,US);
B63H5/02 (US);
B63H5/07 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | B60F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMPHIBISCHES EINRAD | [2016/22] | English: | AMPHIBIOUS UNICYCLE | [2016/22] | French: | MONOCYCLE AMPHIBIE | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2016 | Translation filed | 25.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 28.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2019 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.07.2013 | AL | 04.12.2019 | CY | 04.12.2019 | CZ | 04.12.2019 | DK | 04.12.2019 | EE | 04.12.2019 | FI | 04.12.2019 | HR | 04.12.2019 | LT | 04.12.2019 | LV | 04.12.2019 | MC | 04.12.2019 | MK | 04.12.2019 | MT | 04.12.2019 | RO | 04.12.2019 | RS | 04.12.2019 | SE | 04.12.2019 | SI | 04.12.2019 | SK | 04.12.2019 | SM | 04.12.2019 | TR | 04.12.2019 | BG | 04.03.2020 | GR | 05.03.2020 | IS | 04.04.2020 | PT | 29.04.2020 | IE | 24.07.2020 | LU | 24.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.07.2013 | |
AL | 04.12.2019 | ||
CY | 04.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
MT | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
TR | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.07.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
IE | 24.07.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 24.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
MC | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SI | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
DK | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
IS | 04.04.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
SK | 04.12.2019 | ||
SM | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
EE | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
PT | 29.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
CZ | 04.12.2019 | ||
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RO | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 04.12.2019 | |
FI | 04.12.2019 | ||
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
HR | 04.12.2019 | ||
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
RS | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
LV | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 04.12.2019 | |
LT | 04.12.2019 | ||
SE | 04.12.2019 | ||
BG | 04.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1357571 (ASHER KNEPPER) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US3934291 (HAGEN FREDERIC) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 65 - line 68; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE3103961 (BASTANI HESSARI NAVID) [A] 1-12 * figures 6,33,34 *; | [Y]US2001042650 (VAN DEN BERG KAREL [NL]) [Y] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004182625 (PAL ANADISH KUMAR [IN]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figure - *; | [A]WO2008049050 (NAVATEK LTD [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]FR2491399 (GEERCKE ANDRE [FR]); | [A]CN101085594 (TIANFU LI [CN]); | [A]CN101547802 (NAVATEK LTD [US]); | [A]WO2010031093 (MONDL PETER [AT]); | [A]CN102069691 (BEIJING INST TECHNOLOGY) |