|
18.07.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2024 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2024 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Declaration of eligibility for a reduction of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2024 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2024 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2024 |
Request for change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2024 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.05.2023 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2019 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
10.02.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2017 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Comments on Written Opinion of ISA |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
19 |