EP3035863 - ELASTIC BAND LIGATION DEVICE WITH LOCKING MECHANISM AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF HEMORRHOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRH Medical Corporation 999 Canada Place World Trade Center Suite 522 Vancouver, British Columbia V6C 3E1 / CA | For all designated states Guttenplan, Mitchel 2270 Roxburgh Drive Roswell, GA 30076 / US | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTTENPLAN, Mitchel 2955 Arabian Drive Park City, Utah 84060 / US | 02 /
CHOTENOVSKY, David 287 Stanley Street Barrie, ON L4M 6X7 / CA | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/26] | 01 /
GUTTENPLAN, Mitchel 2270 Roxburgh Drive Roswell, GA 30076 / US | ||
02 /
CHOTENOVSKY, David 287 Stanley Street Barrie, ON L4M 6X7 / CA | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/26] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 13891710.9 | 23.10.2013 | [2016/26] | WO2013US66397 | Priority number, date | US201313972168 | 21.08.2013 Original published format: US201313972168 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015026378 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3035863 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B17/08, A61B17/10 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A61B17/12009 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00818 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | ELASTISCHE BANDBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM VERRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HÄMORRHOIDEN | [2016/26] | English: | ELASTIC BAND LIGATION DEVICE WITH LOCKING MECHANISM AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF HEMORRHOIDS | [2016/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIGATURE PAR BANDE ÉLASTIQUE AVEC MÉCANISME DE BLOCAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DES HÉMORROÏDES | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 29.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5741273 (O'REGAN PATRICK J [CA]) [X] 1,7,14 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 5; figures 3-4; claims 1, 8, 13 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 13 * [Y] 2-6,8,9,13 [I] 10-12; | [Y]EP0696437 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 2-6 * page 7, lines 16-50; figures 3-9; claims 4, 7-9 *; | [Y]WO0003642 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 8,9 * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 9; figures 5, 8 *; | [Y]WO2008064344 (APPLIED MED RESOURCES [US], et al) [Y] 13 * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 13; figure 15 *; | [A]US2004267287 (NESPER MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-2; claims 5-6 *; | [A]US3760810 (VAN HOORN M) [A] 1,8-12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004097969 (FORTIER RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 2-6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2010063517 (CLEATOR LAIN G M [CA]) [A] 7-9 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-4; claim 30 *; | [A]US6482213 (RIZA EROL D [US]) [A] 8,9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]CA614878 (SHUTE WALLACE B) [A] 10 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 6; figures 2, 4; claims 4-9 *; | [A]US2010160863 (HEUSER RICHARD R [US]) [A] 13 * paragraph [0052]; figure 7 *; | [A]EP2111782 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 13 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039]; figures 5-6B * | International search | [A]US2010063517 (CLEATOR LAIN G M [CA]); | [A]US5741273 (O'REGAN PATRICK J [CA]); | [A]US2009198255 (IKEDA MASAO [JP]); | [A]US2002072757 (AHMED MUNIR [US], et al); | [A]US7488333 (GHAREEB ESSAM MOHAMED [GB]) |