EP3036707 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INSURANCE DESIGN USING STANDARD INSURANCE CONTEXTS AND FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebaotech Corporation KIC Plaza Building 3 270 Song Hu Road Shanghai 200433 / CN | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE, Weiliang 6G-11 Lane 2 Weifang Rd. (W) Shanghai 200122 / CN | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 13891836.2 | 23.08.2013 | [2016/26] | WO2013CN82212 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015024264 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3036707 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/08 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
G06Q40/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN VERSICHERUNGSKONZEPT MIT STANDARDVERSICHERUNGSKONTEXTEN UND -FAKTOREN | [2016/26] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INSURANCE DESIGN USING STANDARD INSURANCE CONTEXTS AND FACTORS | [2016/26] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONCEPTION D'ASSURANCE UTILISANT DES FACTEURS ET CONTEXTES D'ASSURANCE STANDARD | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 10.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/48] | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2011153369 (FELDMAN JULIA M [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0107] * | International search | [X]WO03048891 (SWISS REINSURANCE COMPANY); | [A]WO2005048050 (SWISS REINSURANCE COMPANY); | [A]CN103038795 (THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC.); | [A]US2006053037 (KENDALL, ERROL O. ET AL.) |