EP3042703 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR CYBER-PHYSICAL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Obshchestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennostyu "Kiberneticheskiye Tekhnologii" Ul. Zheleznodorozhnaya 68, kv. 26 Pushkin, St. Petersburg 196606 / RU | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIVOSHEIN, Boris Nikolaevich ul. Shahmatova 4 corp. 1 kv. 20 Petergof St. Petersburg 198504 / RU | 02 /
LUCHIN, Roman Mikhaylovich ul. Zheleznodorozhnaya 68 kv. 26 Pushkin St. Petersburg 196606 / RU | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Chimini, Francesco Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 13892832.0 | 14.11.2013 | [2016/28] | WO2013RU01015 | Priority number, date | RU20130140990 | 06.09.2013 Original published format: RU 2013140990 | [2016/28] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015034390 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | RU | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3042703 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 12.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A63H30/04, G05B19/042, G05D1/00, B64C27/06, B62D57/00, B62D57/02, B62D61/00 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
A63H30/04 (EP,US);
G05D1/0016 (US);
B62D57/02 (US);
B62D61/00 (US);
B64C27/06 (US);
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
G05D1/0022 (US);
G05D1/0038 (US);
G05D1/0088 (EP,US);
Y10S901/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | A63H30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Extension states | BA | 06.04.2016 | ME | 06.04.2016 | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR CYBER-PHYSIKALISCHE SYSTEME | [2016/28] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR CYBER-PHYSICAL SYSTEMS | [2016/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈMES CYBERNÉTIQUES-PHYSIQUES | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2016 | Translation filed | 06.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 07.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/39] | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008133052 (JONES JOSEPH L [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0089] - [0094] - [ 144] - [0154]; figures 6,7,15,16,23 * | International search | [A]US2006279246 (HASHIMOTO YOSHIKI [JP], et al); | [X]US2008133052 (JONES JOSEPH L [US], et al); | [A]US2010030378 (CHOI DOO-JIN [KR], et al); | [A]US2010030471 (WATANABE TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2006279246 |