EP3045104 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIYAMA, Toshiya OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
KANDA, Yamato OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-shi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
KITAMURA, Makoto OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-shi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
KONO, Takashi OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-shi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/29] | 01 /
KAMIYAMA, Toshiya c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
KANDA, Yamato c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
KITAMURA, Makoto c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
KONO, Takashi c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13893454.2 | 13.09.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013JP74903 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015037141 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3045104 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, A61B1/00, G06T7/60, G06T7/00 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/60 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10068 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30032 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/29] | A61B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2016/29] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2016/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ, ET PROGRAMME | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2016 | Translation filed | 30.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 18.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1441310 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2005192880 (OLYMPUS CORP) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007244518 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XA]US2013208958 (TOMOTO YUSUKE [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0048] - [0118] * [A] 4-6,10 | International search | [Y]JP2007244518 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [Y]JP2007244519 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [A]JP2007244517 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP); | [Y]WO2007119297 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009297450 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | JP2918162B | JP2002165757 | JP2005192880 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 114 - 117 | - MORPHOLOGY, pages 82 - 90 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, page 196 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 181 - 182 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 185 - 186 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 178 - 179 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 182 - 183 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 114 - 121 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 211 - 214 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 197 - 198 | - DIGITAL IMAGE PROCESSING, pages 229 - 230 |