EP3046081 - SECURITY ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM AND SECURITY ACCESS CONTROL METHOD USING COVERED PASSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jang, Jae Sung Janghang dongHosu Maeul 307-401 78 Norumok-ro Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 410-837 / KR | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Scheele, Friedrich Scheele Wetzel Patentanwälte Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Scheele, Friedrich Ratner Prestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13893546.5 | 25.09.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013KR08577 | Priority number, date | KR20130109785 | 12.09.2013 Original published format: KR 20130109785 | [2016/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015037772 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046081 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G08B13/19645 (EP,US);
G07C9/00 (KR);
G07C9/37 (EP,US);
G06V40/172 (US);
G07C9/10 (EP,US);
G08B13/196 (US);
H04N7/181 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSZUGANGSKONTROLLSYSTEM UND SICHERHEITSZUGANGSKONTROLLVERFAHREN MIT BEDECKTEM DURCHGANG | [2016/29] | English: | SECURITY ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM AND SECURITY ACCESS CONTROL METHOD USING COVERED PASSAGE | [2016/29] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS DE SÉCURITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS DE SÉCURITÉ À L'AIDE DE PASSAGE COUVERT | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2016 | Translation filed | 08.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 16.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/40] | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2017 | 30.09.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]KR20100055601 (PARK SANG CHEOL [KR]); | [Y]KR20050047272 (KT CORP [KR]); | [A]KR101046655B (DANUSYS LTD [KR]); | [A]US3965827 (REEVES TOM); | [A]KR20010001321U (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) | by applicant | KR100419957B | KR100643670B | KR101017588B |