EP3054631 - RECEPTION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIGEEDA, Tetsuya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 13894116.6 | 30.09.2013 | [2016/32] | WO2013JP76535 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045151 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054631 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3054631 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40, H04L12/863, H04L12/879 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
H04L12/40169 (EP,US);
H04L47/622 (US);
H04L49/9026 (US)
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | H04L12/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/32] | English: | RECEPTION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2016/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2016 | Translation filed | 29.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 06.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2013 | AL | 13.02.2019 | AT | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | DK | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | ES | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | IT | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | NL | 13.02.2019 | PL | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | RS | 13.02.2019 | SE | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | TR | 13.02.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | GB | 30.09.2019 | IE | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | LU | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
IE | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
DK | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 13.02.2019 | |
ES | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.02.2019 | |
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RS | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
SE | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6948186 (BROSEY STEVEN A [US]) [I] 2-5 * column 2, lines 3-24 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 62 *; | [I]US2006067231 (IKOMA TATSURO [JP], et al) [I] 3* abstract *; | [IA]WO2008054941 (LIQUID COMPUTING CORP [CA], et al) [I] 1,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [00 9]; figure 1; claim 12 * [A] 7 | International search | [X]JP2003244665 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC); | [Y]JP2012175490 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP2000235536 |