EP3055182 - PARALLEL TRACKS DESIGN DESCRIPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York Air Brake LLC 748 Starbuck Avenue Watertown, NY 13601 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIPPEY, Jeffrey S. 4307 Foxborough Trail Arlington, Texas 76001 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Sean 2133 Heger Way Elk Grove, California 95758 / US | 03 /
JEE, Sung-Ho 27 Calley Drive Leeming, Western Australia 6149 / AU | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2016/33] | Application number, filing date | 13895273.4 | 10.10.2013 | [2016/33] | WO2013US64329 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015053778 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3055182 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B61L23/00, B61L25/00, G01S19/50, B61L25/06, B61L3/12, B61L3/00, B61L15/00, B61L25/02 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
B61L15/0062 (EP);
B61L15/009 (EP,RU);
B61L25/025 (EP);
B61L25/06 (EP);
B61L3/125 (EP);
B61L25/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/33] | B61L23/00, B61L25/00, G01S19/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | BESCHREIBUNG DES DESIGNS VON PARALLELFÜHRUNGEN | [2016/33] | English: | PARALLEL TRACKS DESIGN DESCRIPTION | [2016/33] | French: | DESCRIPTION DE LA CONSTRUCTION DE VOIES PARALLÈLES | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 19.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2021 | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/06] | 22.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3937432 (BIRKIN MICHAEL S) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]DE2512910 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG) [X] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US5415369 (HUNGATE JOE B [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 2 ** page 3 *; | [X]US2009105893 (KERNWEIN JEFFREY D [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US6397130 (CARR GARY A [US], et al); | [X]US2009105893 (KERNWEIN JEFFREY D [US]); | [Y]US2009216395 (KERNWEIN JEFFREY D [US]); | [A]US8452467 (KUMAR AJITH KUTTANNAIR [US]) | by applicant | US3937432 |