Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015062111 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN86517 | 04.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10028177 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2018 | B2 | US2016249258 | 25.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN86517 | 04.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105122882B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2019 | B | CN105122882 | 02.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN86517 | 04.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3057357 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2019 | B1 | EP3057357 | 05.10.2016 | A4 | EP3057357 | 17.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013CN86517 | 04.11.2013 |