EP3068260 - SPIRAL BRISTLE HAVING STRAND COMPONENTS WITH DIFFERENT ORAL CARE ADDITIVES, AND ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2016/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XI, Wen Jin Room 203 No. 8 Dong San Li Qiao 170 Pudong New Area Shanghai 200125 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Ting HanJiang Area 8 Gaolujie Road, HangJi Town Yangshou 225111 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Bo No. 8 Colgate Road, Hangji Town Guangling District Yangzhou City 225111 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Guang Sheng No. 8 Gaolujie Road Hang Ji Town Han Jiang Area Yangzhou 225111 / CN | [2021/48] |
Former [2016/38] | 01 /
XI, Wen Jin Room 203 No. 8 Dong San Li Qiao 170 Pudong New Area Shanghai 200125 / CN | ||
02 /
YAN, Ting Room 203 No. 8 Dong San Li Qiao 170 Pudong New Area Shanghai 200125 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Bo No. 8 Gaolujie Road Hang Ji Town Han Jiang Area Yangzhou 225111 / CN | |||
04 /
GUO, Guang Sheng No. 8 Gaolujie Road Hang Ji Town Han Jiang Area Yangzhou 225111 / CN | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/48] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/38] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13899289.6 | 12.12.2013 | [2016/38] | WO2013CN89172 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015085528 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068260 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3068260 | Date: | 01.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A46B11/0068 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (KR,US);
A46B11/0003 (KR,US);
A46B9/028 (KR);
A46D1/006 (EP,US);
A46D1/0207 (EP,US);
A46D1/0215 (EP,US);
A46D1/023 (KR);
A46D1/0238 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIRALBÜRSTE MIT STRANGKOMPONENTEN MIT VERSCHIEDENEN MUNDPFLEGEADDITIVEN UND MUNDPFLEGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2016/38] | English: | SPIRAL BRISTLE HAVING STRAND COMPONENTS WITH DIFFERENT ORAL CARE ADDITIVES, AND ORAL CARE IMPLEMENT COMPRISING THE SAME | [2016/38] | French: | POIL EN SPIRALE POSSÉDANT DES COMPOSANTS DE BRIN AVEC DIFFÉRENTS ADDITIFS DE SOINS BUCCO-DENTAIRES ET INSTRUMENT DE SOINS BUCCO-DENTAIRES LE COMPRENANT | [2016/38] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/38] | 12.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2021 | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2013 | AL | 01.12.2021 | AT | 01.12.2021 | CY | 01.12.2021 | CZ | 01.12.2021 | DK | 01.12.2021 | EE | 01.12.2021 | ES | 01.12.2021 | FI | 01.12.2021 | HR | 01.12.2021 | IT | 01.12.2021 | LT | 01.12.2021 | LV | 01.12.2021 | MC | 01.12.2021 | MK | 01.12.2021 | NL | 01.12.2021 | PL | 01.12.2021 | RO | 01.12.2021 | RS | 01.12.2021 | SE | 01.12.2021 | SI | 01.12.2021 | SK | 01.12.2021 | SM | 01.12.2021 | IE | 12.12.2021 | LU | 12.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | BG | 01.03.2022 | NO | 01.03.2022 | GR | 02.03.2022 | IS | 01.04.2022 | PT | 01.04.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CY | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 12.12.2013 | |
AL | 01.12.2021 | ||
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
IT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SI | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 01.12.2021 | |
AT | 01.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
IE | 12.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
DK | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
IS | 01.04.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
MC | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
CZ | 01.12.2021 | ||
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SK | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
EE | 01.12.2021 | ||
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RO | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
PT | 01.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
SM | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
NL | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
NO | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
SE | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
GR | 02.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
ES | 01.12.2021 | ||
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
HR | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
LV | 01.12.2021 | ||
PL | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
FI | 01.12.2021 | ||
LT | 01.12.2021 | ||
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.12.2021 | |
RS | 01.12.2021 | ||
BG | 01.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 01.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6141819 (DRIESEN GEORGES [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1,20 *; | [Y]CN1582865 (ZHONGCE INDUSTRY AND TRADE CO [CN]) [Y] 1-15* claims 1,4 * | International search | [A]JPH0387322U (KUSANO YASUHIKO); | [A]JPH03289906 (ISHIKAWA MITSUO); | [A]US6823552 (HILLENBRAND STEPHEN J [US]); | [A]CN201019215Y (LIXIN SU [CN]) | by applicant | US6141819 | CN1582865 | US7143462 |