EP3073698 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING ADDRESS RESOLUTION PROTOCOL MESSAGE, FORWARDER AND CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Shiyong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Hui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
NI, Hui Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2016/39] | Application number, filing date | 13899302.7 | 13.12.2013 | [2016/39] | WO2013CN89377 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015085576 | Date: | 18.06.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3073698 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/721 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H04L61/103 (EP,CN,US);
H04L61/5007 (US);
H04L2101/622 (US);
H04L45/38 (EP,US);
H04L45/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER ADRESSAUFLÖSUNGSPROTOKOLLNACHRICHT, FORWARDER UND STEUERUNG | [2016/39] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING ADDRESS RESOLUTION PROTOCOL MESSAGE, FORWARDER AND CONTROLLER | [2016/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGE DE PROTOCOLE DE RÉSOLUTION D'ADRESSE, UNITÉ DE RÉACHEMINEMENT ET CONTRÔLEUR | [2016/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2016 | Translation filed | 20.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 29.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/48] | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012093429 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] *; | [XI]WO2012133290 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-18; | EP2693696 [ ] (NEC CORP [JP]); | [I] - GUILLERMO IBANEZ ET AL, "Implementation of ARP-path low latency bridges in Linux and OpenFlow/NetFPGA", HIGH PERFORMANCE SWITCHING AND ROUTING (HPSR), 2011 IEEE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110704), doi:10.1109/HPSR.2011.5986000, ISBN 978-1-4244-8454-6, pages 30 - 35, XP032019389 [I] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HPSR.2011.5986000 | International search | [A]CN102143068 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [X]WO2012133290 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]CN103051538 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |