EP3052970 - PORE SIZE CLASSIFICATION IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATIONS BASED ON NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE (NMR) RELAXATION DISTRIBUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALFORD, James, E. 3311 Ashmont Lane Missouri City, Texas 77459 / US | 02 /
BALLIET, Ronnel C. 2030 Briargreen Drive Houston, Texas 77077 / US | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 13899519.6 | 19.12.2013 | [2016/32] | WO2013US76679 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015094307 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3052970 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/32, G01V3/38 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
G01V3/38 (EP,US);
G01V3/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PORENGRÖSSENKLASSIFIZIERUNG IN UNTERIRDISCHER FORMATIONEN AUF DER BASIS VON KERNMAGNETRESONANZ (NMR)-RELAXATIONSVERTEILUNGEN | [2016/32] | English: | PORE SIZE CLASSIFICATION IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATIONS BASED ON NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE (NMR) RELAXATION DISTRIBUTIONS | [2016/32] | French: | CLASSIFICATION DE DIMENSION DE PORE DANS DES FORMATIONS SOUTERRAINES EN FONCTION DE DISTRIBUTIONS DE RELAXATION DE RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE NUCLÉAIRE (RMN) | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2013261973 (LI, LILONG) | [A]US2012065888 (WU ET AL.) | [A]US2013261979 (AL-MUTHANA ET AL.) | [A]US2008183390 (HAMDAN ET AL.) | [A]US2006055403 (FREEDMAN, ROBERT) |