EP3084753 - ATTACHMENT ARRANGEMENT FOR STRINGS OF STRINGED INSTRUMENT, ESPECIALLY GUITAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecnomar Oy Verkkokuja 7 B Espoo 02230 / FI | [2016/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTTILA, Tom Verkkokuja 7 B FI- 02230 Espoo / FI | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 13899838.0 | 18.12.2013 | [2016/43] | WO2013FI51177 | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015092115 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3084753 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G10D3/14, G10D3/04, G10D3/12 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
G10D3/12 (EP,US);
G10D1/08 (EP);
G10D3/04 (EP,US);
G10D3/14 (US);
G10D3/153 (EP,US);
G10H1/32 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/43] | G10D1/08, G10H3/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR SAITEN EINES SAITENINSTRUMENTS, INSBESONDERE EINER GITARRE | [2016/43] | English: | ATTACHMENT ARRANGEMENT FOR STRINGS OF STRINGED INSTRUMENT, ESPECIALLY GUITAR | [2016/43] | French: | ARRANGEMENT DE FIXATION POUR LES CORDES D'UN INSTRUMENT À CORDES, NOTAMMENT UNE GUITARE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 10.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/39] | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA2077736 (CLEMENT ANDREW [CA]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * * page 7, line 20 - line 25 * * page 8, line 13 - line 18 * * page 9, line 6 - line 11 * * page 9, line 16 - line 18 * * page 10, line 15 - line 20 * * page 11, line 2 - line 6 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 3 * [I] 4-10; | [XD]FR2780542 (SOUSTRE ARNAUD YVES RENE [FR]) [XD] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * * page 3, line 9 - line 12 *; | [X]DE3520843 (SEEHAWER DIRK) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 3, line 15 - line 22 * * page 4, line 1 - line 10 * * page 4, line 15 - line 31 *; | [A]US2010064877 (DECK BRENT DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US6100459 (YOST JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]DE3526928 (FENDER C L); | [A]US2005204892 (MINAKUCHI KIYOSHI [JP]) | by applicant | US4171661 | US4497236 | US4686883 | CA2077736 | DE3520843 | US5986190 |