EP3015322 - THROUGH ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enshu Co., Ltd. 748 Kamiaraya Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0831 / JP | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Tadao 65-6 Konodai Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0077 / JP | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13899903.2 | 18.12.2013 | [2016/18] | WO2013JP83985 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015092890 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015322 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.06.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/24 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
B60R22/24 (EP,KR,US);
B60R22/18 (KR);
B60R2022/1831 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | UMLENKBESCHLAG | [2016/18] | English: | THROUGH ANCHOR | [2016/18] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ANCRAGE TRAVERSANT | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2016 | Translation filed | 26.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 03.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2639118 (ENSHU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0057] , [0058] * * figures 1, 6A, 6B *; | [A]EP0721867 (YUGENGAISHA MUTSUMICHI KENKYUJ [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]JP2000085526 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [A] 1-5 * figure - * | International search | JP2013091446 [ ] | [X]JP2000272472 (SANOH INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.) | [X]JPH10166998 (ENSHU CO., LTD.) | [X]JP2002096712 (TAKATA CORP.) |