EP2754594 - Method and device for controlling a compressed air braking system of a vehicle combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diekmeyer, Heinrich Nienstedter Stadtweg 13 30890 Barsinghausen / DE | 02 /
Feyerabend, Konrad Gifhorner Str. 19 30625 Hannover / DE | [2014/29] | Application number, filing date | 14000054.8 | 08.01.2014 | [2014/29] | Priority number, date | DE20131000275 | 09.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013000275 | [2014/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2754594 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2754594 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2754594 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/26, B60T17/02 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
B60T13/263 (EP);
B60T13/683 (EP);
B60T17/02 (EP);
B60T7/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2014/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Druckluft-Bremsanlage eines Fahrzeuggespanns | [2014/29] | English: | Method and device for controlling a compressed air braking system of a vehicle combination | [2014/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande d'une installation de freinage à air comprimé d'un train de véhicule automobile | [2014/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 11.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2017
04.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH, et al, et al Grünstraße 25 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2017
04.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, et al, et al Grünstraße 22-24 (Eingang: Kö-Höfe 60D) 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2017/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.04.2017
Knorr-Bremse Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Str. 80 80809 München / DE Opponent's representative Kietzmann, Lutz, et al, et al Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Grünstrasse 22-24 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | 07.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.09.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.10.2018 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.07.2019 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2014 | AL | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | MT | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | IE | 08.01.2017 | LU | 08.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | GB | 08.01.2018 | AT | 08.01.2019 | [2020/23] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
TR | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 08.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
GB | 08.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.01.2017 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 08.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0119505 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 20* page 1 - page 4; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE19913248 (CUMMINS ENGINE CO INC [US]) [AD] 1,5,11,20 * page 1 - page 5; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102009017903 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [A] 1,5,11,12,17,20,27 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0119505 | EP0335086 | WO9807588 | EP0827470 | DE19913248 | EP1183172 | Opposition | EP0827470 | DE19913726 | EP1183172 | DE102008056322 | - HANS-PETER KLUG, "Nutzfahrzeug-Bremsanlagen", Kraftfahrzeugtechnik, (20000000), ISBN 3-8023-0818-2, XP055376632 | - HANS-PETER KLUG:, "Nutzfahrzeug-Bremsanlagen", KRAFTFAHRZEUGTECHNIK, XP055376632 |