Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2789617 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2789617



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 286
21.06.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.08.2016 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.06.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 45
22.02.2016 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 45
27.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
18.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
15.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
15.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.07.2014 Notice on debiting of fees Search / examination 1
30.06.2014 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
27.06.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
10.06.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.05.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
23.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.04.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
22.04.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.03.2014 Invitation to file missing parts of description/drawings Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 Description Search / examination 58
26.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
09.02.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 56