Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9679890 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2017 | B2 | US2015043114 | 12.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461949053 | 06.03.2014 | US201361864271 | 09.08.2013 | US201414454435 | 07.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9696736 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2017 | B2 | US2014266102 | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414199704 | 06.03.2014 | US201361787123 | 15.03.2013 | US201361864271 | 09.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104347723B | Global Dossier | 01.10.2019 | B | CN104347723 | 11.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461949053 | 06.03.2014 | US201361864271 | 09.08.2013 | US201414454435 | 07.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104052038B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2019 | B | CN104052038 | 17.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414199704 | 06.03.2014 | US201461949053 | 06.03.2014 | US201361787123 | 15.03.2013 | US201361864271 | 09.08.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2779346 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2020 | B1 | EP2779346 | 11.02.2015 | A3 | EP2779346 | 17.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201414199704 | 06.03.2014 | US201461949053 | 06.03.2014 | US201361787123 | 15.03.2013 | US201361864271 | 09.08.2013 |