EP2789716 - Round comb of a combing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peulen, Jacques Bergacherstrasse 22A CH-8630 Rüti / CH | 02 /
Steibli, Sadiah Hanna Schillerstrasse 6 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
Tscherfinger, Hans Neumühlestrasse 59 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 14000962.2 | 14.03.2014 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | CH20130000763 | 12.04.2013 Original published format: CH 7632013 | [2014/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2789716 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2789716 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D01G19/10 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
D01G19/105 (EP);
F16D1/087 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/42] | Title | German: | Rundkamm einer Kämmmaschine | [2014/42] | English: | Round comb of a combing machine | [2014/42] | French: | Peigne rond d'une peigneuse | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 11.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2014 | AL | 16.09.2015 | BG | 16.09.2015 | CY | 16.09.2015 | CZ | 16.09.2015 | DK | 16.09.2015 | EE | 16.09.2015 | ES | 16.09.2015 | FI | 16.09.2015 | HR | 16.09.2015 | LT | 16.09.2015 | LV | 16.09.2015 | MC | 16.09.2015 | MK | 16.09.2015 | MT | 16.09.2015 | NL | 16.09.2015 | PL | 16.09.2015 | RO | 16.09.2015 | RS | 16.09.2015 | SE | 16.09.2015 | SI | 16.09.2015 | SK | 16.09.2015 | SM | 16.09.2015 | NO | 16.12.2015 | GR | 17.12.2015 | IS | 16.01.2016 | PT | 18.01.2016 | IE | 14.03.2016 | LU | 14.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | FR | 31.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
BG | 16.09.2015 | ||
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
CY | 16.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.03.2014 | |
CZ | 16.09.2015 | ||
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MK | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
SM | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
MT | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
IE | 14.03.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
MC | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SI | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
DK | 16.09.2015 | ||
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
PL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
PT | 18.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RO | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
SK | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 16.09.2015 | |
EE | 16.09.2015 | ||
ES | 16.09.2015 | ||
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
IS | 16.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 16.09.2015 | |
FI | 16.09.2015 | ||
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NL | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
HR | 16.09.2015 | ||
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
RS | 16.09.2015 | ||
SE | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 16.09.2015 | |
LT | 16.09.2015 | ||
LV | 16.09.2015 | ||
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
GR | 17.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 16.09.2015 | |
NO | 16.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 16.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2426239 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS5857529 | DE10163663 | DE2503976 | EP1383948 | GB205128 | EP2426239 | DE29720656U |