Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9506807 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2014286376 | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013058416 | 21.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6271139B | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B2 | JP2014182106 | 29.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013058416 | 21.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104062028 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013058416 | 21.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2781900 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013058416 | 21.03.2013 |