EP2781900 - Thermometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HORIBA, LTD. 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | [2014/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ido, Takuya Horiba, Ltd., 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Tetsuya Horiba, Ltd., 2, Miyanohigashi-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8510 / JP | [2014/39] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14001026.5 | 20.03.2014 | [2014/39] | Priority number, date | JP20130058416 | 21.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013058416 | [2014/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2781900 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/08, G01J5/00, G01J5/04, G01J5/02, G01J5/58, G01J5/60 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
G01J5/0806 (EP,US);
G01J5/0014 (EP,US);
G01J5/042 (EP,US);
G01J5/051 (EP,US);
G01J5/084 (EP,US);
G01J5/0896 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Thermometer | [2014/39] | English: | Thermometer | [2014/39] | French: | Thermomètre | [2014/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 25.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2000074830 (HORIBA LTD, et al) [YD] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]US6678541 (DURKIN ANTHONY J [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 29 - line 44; figures 1,11 * * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 65 *; | [A]US5781306 (HARTIG WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2000074830 |