EP2774920 - CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF 5-AMINO-2,3-DIHYDROPHTHALAZINE-1,4-DIONE SODIUM SALT AND THEIR MEDICAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MetrioPharm AG Bleicherweg 45 8002 Zürich / CH | [2014/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breu, Josef Lettenstr. 3 95448 Bayreuth / DE | 02 /
Brysch, Wolfgang Rabenhorststr. 7 13505 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kaiser, Astrid Gerstnerweg 2 12305 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Ludescher, Beate Dannenwalder Weg 58 13439 Berlin / DE | 05 /
Maass, Gerrit Im Eichholz 27 30657 Hannover / DE | 06 /
Martin, Thomas Hinterer Berg 6 95100 Selb / DE | 07 /
Milius, Wolfgang Hölderlinanlage 5 95447 Bayreuth / DE | 08 /
Niedermaier, Michael Fritz-Reuter-Allee 46 12359 Berlin / DE | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Seuss, Thomas, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30 J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Seuss, Thomas, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Straße 10 D-10589 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14001134.7 | 01.03.2011 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | EP20100002067 | 01.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10002067 | EP20100075744 | 25.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10075744 | [2014/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2774920 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/32, A61K31/502, A61P37/02 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
C07D237/32 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/502 (CN,KR);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2014/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON 5-AMINO-2,3-DIHYDROPHTHALAZIN-1,4-DION NATRIUMSALZ UND IHRE MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2014/37] | English: | CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF 5-AMINO-2,3-DIHYDROPHTHALAZINE-1,4-DIONE SODIUM SALT AND THEIR MEDICAL USE | [2014/37] | French: | FORMES CRISTALLINES de 5-AMINO-2,3-DIHYDROPHTHALAZINE-1,4-DIONE SEL DE SODIUM ET LEUR USAGE MÉDICAL | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 12.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2018 | 25.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/08] | 15.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2019 | 21.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11710423.2 / EP2542535 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 12.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 12.03.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US6489326 (ABIDOV MUSA TAZHUDINOVICH [RU], et al); | [XP]WO2010082858 (ABIDOPHARMA PL SP Z O O [PL], et al); | by applicant | EP0617024 | US5512573 | US5543410 | RU2113222 | EP1203587 | US6489326 | RU2211036 | US2003195183 | US7326690 |