EP2789763 - Stretchable sealing tape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baumeister, Alexander Im Ellenbügel 37 63505 Langenselbold / DE | [2014/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röttger, Wilhelm Schlüchterner Str. 6 36103 Flieden / DE | 02 /
Röttger, Nils Schlüchterner Str. 6 36103 Flieden / DE | 03 /
Röttger, Lars Schlüchterner Str. 6 36103 Flieden / DE | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 14001270.9 | 07.04.2014 | [2014/42] | Priority number, date | DE20131006110 | 10.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013006110 | [2014/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2789763 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2789763 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/147 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
E04D13/147 (EP);
B21D13/10 (EP);
B21D5/146 (EP);
B32B1/00 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B3/30 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2014/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Streckbares Dichtband | [2014/42] | English: | Stretchable sealing tape | [2014/42] | French: | Bande d'étanchéité étirable | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4333247 (BRAAS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * column 6, lines 54-57; figures 1, 10, 12 * * column 3, lines 3-6 * [Y] 5,6,8,9; | [YA]EP1213403 (KNOCHE ALFONS [DE]) [Y] 9 * figure 1; claims 7-8 * [A] 7; | [AD]DE10230552 (BRINKMANN PETER [DE]) [AD] 7 * figure 3; claims 11-13 *; | [X]JP2009067038 (BABA SHOTEN KK) [X] 1-4 * figures 1b, 3a-b *; | [X]JP2010037736 (BABA SHOTEN KK) [X] 1-4,7 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2010026605 (BERTOZZI MAURIZIO [IT]) [A] 7 * figure 3; claim 4 *; | [YD]DE102008051728 (ROETTGER WILHELM [DE]) [YD] 5,6 * page 4, column 1, paragraph 16 *; | [Y]WO2010110661 (VEENVOORT B V DE [NL], et al) [Y] 8,9* figure - * | by applicant | DE1898873U | US4794052 | CH693322 | DE10230552 | DE102008051728 |