EP2796384 - Means of packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kimmlinger, Karl Am Hang 4 66578 Schiffweiler / DE | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Wieske, Thilo, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske PartGmbB Feldmannstrasse 110 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Wieske, Thilo, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Vièl & Wieske Feldmannstrasse 110 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 14001410.1 | 17.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | DE201320101708U | 22.04.2013 Original published format: DE 202013101708 U | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796384 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D65/10, B65D65/40, B65B67/00 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
B65D65/10 (EP);
B65D65/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verpackungsmittel | [2014/44] | English: | Means of packaging | [2014/44] | French: | Matériel d'emballage | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 30.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4549653 (LAURITZEN NELS J [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 59; figure 2 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]DE202009015625U (KIMMLINGER KARL [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1A-2C *; | [Y]US3016806 (SCHOEN WALTER A, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1541493 (CRYOVAC INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0040]; figures 3,7 * |