EP2796269 - Device and method for the sterilisation of the outside of plastic preforms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seidenberg, Katharina Redtenbacherstraße 7 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Kohl, Bettina Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
Loy, Michael Böhmerwaldstr.5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 04 /
Söllner, Jürgen Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 05 /
Goldbach, Marina Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 06 /
Schmitt, Robert Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 07 /
Bedoe, Ute Böhmerwaldstr. 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
Seidenberg, Katharina Redtenbacherstraße 7 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2018/09] |
Former [2014/44] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14001461.4 | 24.04.2014 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | DE201310104152 | 24.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013104152 | [2014/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2796269 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2796269 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/42, B29L31/00, B29C49/06, A61L2/18, A61L2/20, A61L2/22, B67C7/00, A61L2/00, A61L9/00, // B29L31/16 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B29C49/4252 (EP,US);
A61L2/16 (US);
A61L2/00 (EP,US);
A61L9/00 (EP,US);
B08B9/283 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/4205 (EP,US);
B29C49/42405 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | B29C49/42, B29L31/00, B29C49/06, A61L2/18, A61L2/20, A61L2/22, B67C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Außensterilisation von Kunststoffvorformlingen | [2014/44] | English: | Device and method for the sterilisation of the outside of plastic preforms | [2014/44] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de stérilisation extérieure de préformes en matière plastique | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 22.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17208680.3 / EP3330058 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.2018
03.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE KHS Corpoplast GmbH Meiendorfer Strasse 203 22145 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser, et al, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2021/12] |
Former [2019/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.11.2018
ADMISSIBLE KHS Corpoplast GmbH Meiendorfer Strasse 203 22145 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Beselerstrasse 6 22607 Hamburg / DE | 12.12.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.04.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.05.2020 | 07.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.04.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/01] | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2014 | AL | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | MT | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | IE | 24.04.2018 | LU | 24.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | GB | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | AT | 24.04.2019 | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IS | 28.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GB | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 24.04.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008049876 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-4; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]EP1941913 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR]) [Y] 7,9 * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] - [0040] - [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]EP2394950 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8,10-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0029] , [0038] - [0040] - [0053] - [0055] - [0057] , [0120] - [0132]; figures 2-8; claims 1-10 * [Y] 7,9 [I] 3,5,6 | Examination | WO9618541 | JP2009274740 | DE102008038141 | EP2556943 | - ANONYMOUS, "High-efficiency particulate arrestance (HEPA)", (201608), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Special:Book&bookcmd=download&collection_id=cfbe3c4a4dc79647b8b1f066d8fed314127c50ac&writer=rdf2latex&return_to=HEPA, (20160819), XP055296593 | Opposition | US1094785 | US4074654 | DE4425219 | WO9618541 | DE19956186 | DE69713157T | WO2008055685 | US2008152538 | EP2000285 | JP2009274740 | US2009317506 | WO2010003973 | DE102008038141 | DE102008038143 | US2010229895 | WO2011027370 | EP2295324 | WO2011101007 | EP2394950 | EP2556943 | EP2684673 |