EP2775724 - Method for processing three dimensional (3D) video signal and digital broadcast receiver for performing the processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suh, Jong Yeul c/o LG Electronics Inc. Intellectual Property Center 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu 137-724 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Yang, Jeong Hyu c/o LG Electronics Inc. Intellectual Property Center 16 Woomyeon-dong Seocho-gu 137-724 Seoul / KR | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14001871.4 | 18.12.2009 | [2014/37] | Priority number, date | US20090161757P | 19.03.2009 Original published format: US 161757 P | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2775724 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2775724 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/172 (KR);
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N2213/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines dreidimensionalen Videosignals und digitaler Rundfunkempfänger für das Verarbeitungsverfahren | [2014/37] | English: | Method for processing three dimensional (3D) video signal and digital broadcast receiver for performing the processing method | [2014/37] | French: | Procédé de traitement de signal vidéo tridimensionnel (3D) et récepteur numérique multidiffusion conçu pour mettre en oeuvre le procédé de traitement | [2014/37] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 19.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09841958.3 / EP2409494 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008153294 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0114] , [0118] - [0147] - [0158] , [0189] - [0198]; figures 6A,6B,6C,8A,8B,10,12 *; | [A]US2005041737 (MATSUMURA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |