|
28.11.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2019 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2019 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.05.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2019 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
32 |
|
03.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
03.01.2018 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Correction to published European patent application/patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
20.02.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2014 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |