blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2913456

EP2913456 - Process to manufacture a floor structure with edge-insulating strip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/36]PROCESS TO MANUFACTURE A FLOOR STRUCTURE WITH EDGE-INSULATING STRIP
[2019/15]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.02.2020  [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Steinbacher Dämmstoff Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Salzburger Straße 35
6383 Erpfendorf / AT
[2018/17]
Former [2015/36]For all designated states
Kingspan Gefinex GmbH
Jakobsdorfer Strasse 1
16928 Pritzwalk / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Retsch, Wolfgang
Dorfstr. 49
16928 Giesendorf / DE
02 / Meyer, Mirko
Schönhagenstr. 15a
16929 Pritzwalk / DE
 [2015/36]
Representative(s)Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck
Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG
Postfach 85
6020 Innsbruck / AT
[N/P]
Former [2015/36]Kaewert, Klaus
Rechtsanwalt Gänsestrasse 4
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date14002443.116.07.2014
[2015/36]
Priority number, dateDE2013102081717.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013020817
DE2014100899824.06.2014         Original published format: DE102014008998
[2015/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2913456
Date:02.09.2015
Language:DE
[2015/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2015
ClassificationIPC:E04F15/14, E04F15/18
[2015/36]
CPC:
E04F15/145 (EP); E04F15/142 (EP); E04F15/188 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Fußbodenaufbaus mit Randdämmstreifen[2019/15]
English:Process to manufacture a floor structure with edge-insulating strip[2019/15]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un plancher doté de bandes de rive[2019/15]
Former [2015/36]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FUßBODENAUFBAUS MIT RANDDÄMMSTREIFEN
Former [2015/36]PROCESS TO MANUFACTURE A FLOOR STRUCTURE WITH EDGE-INSULATING STRIP
Former [2015/36]PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PLANCHER DOTÉ DE BANDES DE RIVE
Examination procedure31.07.2014Examination requested  [2015/36]
30.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/07]
26.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2020/07]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
02.11.2018Request for further processing filed
02.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.11.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201603   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2016
31.07.201704   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.2017
31.07.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE3801725  (MANTEL JUVAL [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * column 1, lines 16-18,34-37,42-49; figures 2,4d * [Y] 7,10,13 [I] 3,6,11,14;
 [XD]DE19636621  (HEWING GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * column 3, lines 29-30; figure 4 * * column 4, lines 15-17 * * column 4, lines 20-24 *;
 [YA]GB2437180  (PROCTOR GROUP LTD A [GB]) [Y] 7,10,13 * page 7, lines 7-20; figure 5 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP1710370  (QUITHELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantDE29714625U
 DE4326441
 DE4442569
 DE3806676
 DE9409699U
 DE3544514
 DE19606126
 DE29710474U
 DE19803948
 DE19636621
 EP1211366
 DE3425038
 DE20105333U
 DE19722756
 DE3527507
 DE202010001033U
 DE4325879
 DE202010003965U
 DE1933292
 DE102004018550
 DE10212729
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.