EP2797020 - Proximity authentication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buer, Mark c/o Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | 02 /
Frank, Edward 83 Tuscaloosa Avenue Atherton, CA 94027 / US | 03 /
Seshadri, Nambirajan 22 Trinity Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | 01 /
Buer, Mark 1027 East Betsy Lane Gilbert, AZ 85296 / US | ||
02 /
Frank, Edward 83 Tuscaloosa Avenue Atherton, CA 94027 / US | |||
03 /
Seshadri, Nambirajan 22 Trinity Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14002578.4 | 30.09.2004 | [2014/44] | Priority number, date | US20030507586P | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 507586 P | US20040609537P | 13.09.2004 Original published format: US 609537 P | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2797020 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2797020 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/35, G06F21/43, H04L29/06, H04L9/32, G07C9/00 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (US);
G06F21/35 (EP,US);
G06Q20/327 (US);
G07C9/20 (EP,US);
H04L63/0807 (US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (US);
H04L9/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2014/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nähe-Authentifizierungssystem | [2014/44] | English: | Proximity authentication system | [2014/44] | French: | Système d'authentification à proximité | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04023384.3 / EP1536306 | Divisional application(s) | EP15001375.3 / EP2937805 | EP15003257.1 / EP3023899 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2003097586 (MOK STEVEN SIONG CHEAK [SG]) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0055] * * claims 1-29 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0071] * [A] 8[I] 4,6,7,9-15 |