EP2979688 - Composition containing Apomorphine and a Divalent Metal Cation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Britannia Pharmaceuticals Ltd. 200 Longwater Avenue, Green Park Reading Berkshire RG2 6 GP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | For all designated states Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited 200 Longwater Avenue, Green Park Reading Berkshire RG2 6 GP / GB | ||
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states Britannia Pharmaceuticals Limited Park View House 65 London Road Newbury, Berkshire RG14 1JN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leader, Ian Philip 9 Lymington Rise Four Marks, Hampshire GU34 5BA / GB | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Kernebeck, Thomas Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH Stiftstraße 2 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 14002689.9 | 01.08.2014 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979688 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/08, A61K47/02, A61K31/473, A61P25/16 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
A61K31/473 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/08 (KR,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/18 (KR);
A61K47/20 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/473, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung mit Apomorphin und divalentem Metallkation | [2016/05] | English: | Composition containing Apomorphine and a Divalent Metal Cation | [2016/05] | French: | Composition contenant de l'apomorphine et un cation de métal divalent | [2016/05] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 09.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011111011 (GIOVINAZZO ANTHONY JOHN [CA], et al) [Y] 6,7* paragraph [0013]; claims 1, 3, 15 *; | [IAY]EP2545905 (BRITANNIA PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [GB]) [I] 1-4,8,9,11,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0016] , [0 20] - [0025] - [0 30] - [0032]; claims 1, 7, 15, 16 * [A] 5,10,13 [Y] 6,7 |