EP2851034 - Dental treating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Morita Manufacturing Corporation 680, Higashihama Minami-Cho, Fushimi-Ku Kyoto-Shi Kyoto 612-8533 / JP | [2015/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuda, Naoki c/o J. Morita Manufacturing Corporation, 680 Higashihama Minami-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8533 / JP | 02 /
Yamashita, Seiichiro c/o J. Morita Manufacturing Corporation, 680 Higashihama Minami-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8533 / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Tomoaki c/o J. Morita Manufacturing Corporation, 680 Higashihama Minami-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8533 / JP | 04 /
Hijikata, Hideo c/o J. Morita Manufacturing Corporation, 680 Higashihama Minami-cho, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto, 612-8533 / JP | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14003022.2 | 02.09.2014 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | JP20130195623 | 20.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013195623 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851034 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2851034 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/48, A61C5/44, A61C5/40, A61C1/18 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A61C5/48 (EP,US);
A61C1/186 (EP,US);
A61C19/041 (EP,US);
A61C5/40 (EP,US);
A61C5/44 (EP,US);
A61C1/0023 (EP,US);
A61C1/003 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/13] | A61C5/02, A61C19/04, A61C1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2015/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zahnbehandlungsvorrichtung | [2015/13] | English: | Dental treating apparatus | [2015/13] | French: | Appareil de traitement dentaire | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 27.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.08.2018
ADMISSIBLE KaVo Kerr 1717 West Collins Avenue Orange CA 92867 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/37] | 21.08.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.12.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2020/32] | 29.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.02.2020 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2014 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | IT | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | GB | 02.09.2018 | IE | 02.09.2018 | LU | 02.09.2018 | MT | 02.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | FR | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.09.2014 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
GB | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
MT | 02.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 02.09.2014 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
GB | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
MT | 02.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
GB | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
MT | 02.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
GB | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
MT | 02.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
GB | 02.09.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 02.09.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 02.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2567671 (VDW GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,11,12,18 * paragraphs [0028] - [0049] * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6,8-10,13-17 [I] 19; | [XAI]WO2010066337 (VDW GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,11,12,14-18 * pages 16-21 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6,8-10,13 [I] 19; | [XY]US5980248 (KUSAKABE HIROAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-11,14,15,18,19 * column 2, line 61 - column 7, line 60 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 7,8,12,13,16,17; | [X]WO0103601 (DENTSPLY INT INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 3 - page 6 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US2013224677 (YAMASHITA SEIICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8,12,13,16,17 * paragraphs [0031] - [0139] * * figures 1-13 * [A] 1-6,9-11,14,15,18,19; | [A]JP2005144194 (MORITA MFG) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0112] - [0167] * * figures 1-12 * | by applicant | JP3264607B | JP3615209B | JP3676753B | JP2003504113 | Opposition | EP2567671 | WO0103601 | WO2010066337 | US2013224677 | US5980248 | JP2005144194 | DE102010027631 | WO2013076106 | DE102013002510 | EP2431004 | WO2012164875 | EP2438884 | EP2716254 | US2002064756 | US2012225406 | WO2013108602 | WO2012097434 | EP2805687 | - Shehab el din mohamed saber et al, "Effect of altering the reciprocation range on the fatigue life and the shaping ability of WaveOne Nickel-Titanium instruments", JOE, (20130500), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 685 - 688, XP055515273 | - A. Peters Ove, Et Al, "Engine driven preparation of curved root canals", Australian endodontic journal, (20020400), vol. 28, pages 11 - 17, XP055515277 | - GIANLUCA GAMBARIBI ET AL, "Influence of different angles of reciprocation on the cyclic fatigue of Nickel- Titanium endodontic instruments", JOE, (20121000), vol. 38, no. 10, pages 1408 - 1411, XP055515288 | - Diop, "A novel platform for in vitro analysis of torque, forces and three-dimensional file displacements during root canal preparations: application to ProTaper rotary files", J. endod., (20080000), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 568 - 572, XP026065979 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joen.2008.12.017 | - G. Gambarini et al, "Cyclic fatigue analysis of twisted file rotary NiTi instruments used in reciprocating motion", INTERNATIONAL ENDODONTIC JOURNAL, (20120319), vol. 45, no. 9, pages 802 - 806, XP055515334 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2591.2012.02036.x | - G. Plotino, et al, "Cyclic fatigue of Reciproc and WaveOne reciprocating instruments", INTERNATIONAL ENDODONTIC JOURNAL, (20120701), vol. 45, no. 7, pages 614 - 618, XP055515336 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2591.2012.02015.x | - O. A. Peters et al, "Dynamic torque and apical forces of ProFile.04 rotary instruments during preparation of curved canals", INTERNATIONAL ENDODONTIC JOURNAL, (20020401), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 379 - 389, XP055515340 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.0143-2885.2001.00494.x | - Tokita D. ET AL, "Dynamic torque and vertical force analysis during Nickel-Titanium rotary root canal preparation with different modes of reciprocal rotation", Joe, (20171000), vol. 43, no. 10, pages 1706 - 1710 | - Craig Rhodes S ET AL, "Comparison of root canal preparation using reciprocating Safesiders stainless steel and Vortex Nickel-Titanium instruments", ORAL SURGERY, ORAL MEDICINE, ORAL PATHOLOGY, ORAL RADIOLOGY AND ENDODONTICS, (20101125), vol. 111, no. 5, pages 659 - 667, XP028379330 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tripleo.2010.11.021 | - Kiefner P. et al, "Is the reciprocating movement per se able to improve the cyclic fatigue resistance of instruments?", vol. 47, no. 5, pages 430 - 436, XP055515362 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/iej.12166 | - Sattapan et al, "Torque during canal instrumentation using rotary Nickel-Titanium files .", JOURNAL OF ENDODONTICS, (20000300), vol. 26, no. 3, pages 156 - 160, XP005386087 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00004770-200003000-00007 | - NSK, "Operation Manual ''ENDO-MATE TC2''", Operation Manual ''ENDO-MATE TC2'', pages 1 - 146 | - PROF. DR. LIVIU STEIER et al., "Reality check on electronically controlled endodontic motors", Endo Tribune, (20110123), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 11 - 13, XP055515377 |