EP2873654 - Building material for the production of sound absorbing construction elements having good thermal properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MABO Naturdämmstoffe GmbH & Co. KG Holtendorf 4 48734 Reken / DE | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borkowski, Martin Holtendorf 4a 48734 Reken / DE | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Auerbach, Bettina, et al Südstrasse 29 08066 Zwickau / DE | [2015/21] | Application number, filing date | 14003177.4 | 14.09.2014 | [2015/21] | Priority number, date | DE20131015091 | 14.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013015091 | [2015/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873654 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B20/12, C04B28/00, C04B28/02, C04B18/28, C04B111/00, C04B111/20, C04B111/28, C04B111/52, C04B111/60 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
C04B28/02 (EP);
C04B18/28 (EP);
C04B20/12 (EP);
C04B28/001 (EP);
C04B2111/00612 (EP);
C04B2111/00655 (EP);
C04B2111/2092 (EP);
C04B2111/28 (EP);
C04B2111/52 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B20/12, C04B18/26, C04B20/107 (EP);
C04B20/12, C04B18/26, C04B20/1077 (EP);
C04B28/001, C04B14/06, C04B20/12 (EP);
C04B28/02, C04B14/06, C04B14/10, C04B18/245, C04B18/26, C04B20/0076, C04B2103/14, C04B2103/54 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Baustoffmischung zur Herstellung von den Schall absorbierenden und mit guten thermischen Eigenschaften ausgestatteten Bauelementen | [2015/21] | English: | Building material for the production of sound absorbing construction elements having good thermal properties | [2015/21] | French: | Mélange de matériaux pour la fabrication de matériaux de construction présentant de bonnes propriétés thermiques et absorbant le son | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 21.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 12.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request rejected | 14.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102010051059 (KUHNHENN ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6; | [XI]DE102006020761 (BORKOWSKI MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [I] 3,6; | [A]WO9932416 (LAFARGE CIMENTS S A [FR], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2772744 (MOULY MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9309943 (WALTER HANSRUEDI [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |