EP3000835 - CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR A POLYESTER MANUFACTURING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/13] | Catalyst composition for a polyester manufacturing process | ||
[2020/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steffanut, Pascal 16 rue de l'Au F-68128 Village-Neuf / FR | 02 /
Sidqi, Mohamed 42 Rue De Soleure F-68350 Brunstatt / FR | 03 /
Dongiovanni, Ernesto 165, Grande Rue 68180 Horbourg-Wihr / FR | 04 /
Abrahmi, Jerome 3 rue des Cevennes 68350 Brunstatt / FR | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Carola, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2020/48] |
Former [2016/13] | Hütter, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 14003298.8 | 24.09.2014 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000835 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3000835 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/183, C08G63/85, C08G63/86 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
C08G63/85 (EP,CN,US);
C08G63/183 (US);
C08G63/866 (EP,CN,US);
C08G63/87 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2016/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Katalysatorzusammensetzung für einen Polyesterherstellungsprozess | [2020/28] | English: | CATALYST COMPOSITION FOR A POLYESTER MANUFACTURING PROCESS | [2020/27] | French: | Composition de catalyseur pour un procédé de fabrication de polyester | [2020/28] |
Former [2016/13] | Katalysatorzusammensetzung für einen Polyesterherstellungsprozess | ||
Former [2016/13] | Catalyst composition for a polyester manufacturing process | ||
Former [2016/13] | Composition de catalyseur pour un procédé de fabrication de polyester | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 17.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2014 | AL | 25.11.2020 | AT | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | CZ | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | NL | 25.11.2020 | PL | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SE | 25.11.2020 | SI | 25.11.2020 | SK | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | NO | 25.02.2021 | GR | 26.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | PT | 25.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SI | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
NL | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
AT | 25.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SK | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
CZ | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
PL | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SE | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
GR | 26.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
NO | 25.02.2021 | ||
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
PT | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9954379 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-15* examples 4, 5, 7, 15 * | by applicant | EP0699708 | WO2005097321 | US2009005531 | US2013131239 | US2013184414 |