|
13.08.2024 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2024 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
23.02.2024 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
23.02.2024 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.11.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.11.2023 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.11.2023 |
Claims submitted during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.11.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2023 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.10.2023 |
Main request during appeals procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.07.2023 |
F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.07.2023 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
18.07.2023 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2023 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2022 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2021 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.11.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
29.04.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.05.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.05.2015 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |