27.06.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] |
26.06.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.06.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.03.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
24.11.2023 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
24.11.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2023 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.07.2023 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
25.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2021 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
29.03.2021 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
24.12.2020 |
New entry: Payment of appeal fee following examination |
|
22.12.2020 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
22.12.2020 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
23.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
16.10.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
23.04.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.02.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2019 |
First examination report |
|
23.09.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.12.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.10.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
03.05.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
07.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|