Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016070964 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414531363 | 03.11.2014 | EP14003698 | 03.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10956955 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B2 | US2019355040 | 21.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414531363 | 03.11.2014 | US201916527810 | 31.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10395294 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2019 | B2 | US2016125497 | 05.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414531363 | 03.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107004026B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2020 | B | CN107004026 | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414531363 | 03.11.2014 | EP14003698 | 03.11.2014 | WO2015EP02110 | 23.10.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3016000 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2024 | B1 | EP3016000 | 04.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14003698 | 03.11.2014 |