EP2891744 - Method for folding laundry items [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/28] | Method and device for folding laundry items | ||
[2016/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH Kannegiesserring 7 32602 Vlotho / DE | [2015/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinz, Engelbert Bretthorstrasse 272 32602 Vlotho / DE | 02 /
Sielmann, Jörg Melanchthonstrasse 41a 33615 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
Meier, Jürgen Twellsiekstrasse 89 32457 Porta Westalica / DE | 04 /
Kröger, Kai Staffelweg 21A 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Möller, Friedrich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Möller, Friedrich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2015/28] | Möller, Friedrich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 14003788.8 | 11.11.2014 | [2015/28] | Priority number, date | DE20141000047 | 07.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014000047 | [2015/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891744 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2891744 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F89/00 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
D06F89/00 (EP,US);
B65H45/16 (US);
D06F89/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Falten von Wäschestücken | [2016/16] | English: | Method for folding laundry items | [2016/16] | French: | Procédé de pliage de pièces de linge | [2016/16] |
Former [2015/28] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Falten von Wäschestücken | ||
Former [2015/28] | Method and device for folding laundry items | ||
Former [2015/28] | Procédé et dispositif de pliage de pièces de linge | Examination procedure | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 10.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15003544.2 / EP3023537 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2014 | AL | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | MT | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | IE | 11.11.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 11.11.2014 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 11.11.2014 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 11.11.2014 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 11.11.2014 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB988477 (RENE LOUIS DUFLOT) [A] 1-13 * figure - *; | [A]EP2327830 (PUREX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] - [0031] - [0034]; figure - *; | [A]EP2392727 (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |