10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
04.01.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
26.01.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
22.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.01.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.09.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.05.2017 |
First examination report |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
15.07.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
08.07.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
08.07.2016 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
30.06.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.11.2015 |
Publication of search report |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
27.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
27.11.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
12.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
20.03.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] |
20.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|