EP2862994 - Power release double-locking latch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Closures Inc. 521 Newpark Boulevard Newmarket, ON L3Y 4X7 / CA | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cetnar, Roman 769 Leslie Valley Drive Ontario Newmarket, L3Y 7J6 / CA | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/17] | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 14003837.3 | 10.08.2005 | [2015/17] | Priority number, date | US20040600311P | 10.08.2004 Original published format: US 600311 P | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2862994 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2862994 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2862994 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/02, E05B57/00, E05B65/00, E05B77/26, E05B77/28, E05B77/54, E05B79/20, E05B81/06, E05B81/14, E05B81/16, E05B81/36, E05B81/76, E05B81/90 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
E05B77/54 (EP,US);
E05B81/76 (EP,KR,US);
E05B77/26 (EP,US);
E05B77/28 (EP,US);
E05B79/20 (EP,US);
E05B81/06 (EP,US);
E05B81/14 (EP,US);
E05B81/16 (EP,US);
E05B81/36 (EP,US);
E05B81/90 (EP,US);
Y10S292/23 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1047 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1082 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5889 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5978 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/17] | E05B77/26, E05B77/28, E05B77/54, E05B79/20, E05B81/06, E05B81/14, E05B81/16, E05B81/36, E05B81/76, E05B81/90 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2015/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftbetriebene Auslöserdoppelverriegelung | [2015/17] | English: | Power release double-locking latch | [2015/17] | French: | Verrou à verrouillage double de libération d'énergie | [2015/17] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05772222.5 / EP1786999 | EP14002725.1 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2005 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | GB | 10.08.2018 | IE | 10.08.2018 | LU | 10.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 10.08.2005 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 10.08.2005 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
GB | 10.08.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 10.08.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 10.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2003070457 (ARLT HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-7 * [A] 7,8[I] 9-14 |