EP2860578 - Backlight unit and liquid crystal display including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2016/35] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Go, Wangseop c/o LG Electronics Inc., IP Center LG Institute 16 Umyeon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 02 /
Seo, Sangho c/o LG Electronics Inc., IP Center LG Institute 16 Umyeon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | [2016/37] |
Former [2015/16] | 01 /
Go, Wangseop c/o LG Electronics Inc., IP Center LG Institute 16 Umyeon-dong Seocho-gu 137-724 Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Seo, Sangho c/o LG Electronics Inc., IP Center LG Institute 16 Umyeon-dong Seocho-gu 137-724 Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/16] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14004288.8 | 12.10.2010 | [2015/16] | Priority number, date | US20090260540P | 12.11.2009 Original published format: US 260540 P | KR20090108953 | 12.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090108953 | US20100301358P | 04.02.2010 Original published format: US 301358 P | [2015/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2860578 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2860578 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, G02F1/13357, G02B6/00, F21V8/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G02B6/0088 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G02F1/133308 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/00 (CN);
G02B6/009 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133603 (CN);
G02F1/133615 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133314 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133607 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/16] | Title | German: | Rückbeleuchtungseinheit und Flüssigkristallanzeige damit | [2015/16] | English: | Backlight unit and liquid crystal display including the same | [2015/16] | French: | Unité de rétroéclairage et affichage à cristaux liquides doté de celle-ci | [2015/16] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 16.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 28.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10830111.0 / EP2499537 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2010 | AL | 14.09.2016 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 12.10.2016 | LU | 12.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 12.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 12.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 12.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20070063290 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1956422 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0055] *; | [A]US2009103328 (IWASAKI OSAMU [JP]) [A] 1-19 * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0309] *; | [AP]EP2202456 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AP] 1-19 * figures 1-6 ** paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0081] * |