EP2719919 - Magnetorheological (MR) piston ring and MR damper having same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BWI Company Limited S.A. 1, rue des Glacis 1628 Luxembourg / LU | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lopez Jr., James L 9500 Moorgate Ct. Dayton, OH 45458 / US | 02 /
Skarbek, Jaroslaw S Ul. Bartla 19C 13 30 399 Krakow / PL | [2019/29] |
Former [2014/16] | 01 /
Lopez Jr., James L 9500 Moorgate Ct. Dayton, OH Ohio OH 45458 / US | ||
02 /
Skarbek, Jaroslaw S Ul. Bartla 19C 13 30 399 Krakow / PL | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2019/29] |
Former [2014/16] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14150800.2 | 24.09.2008 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | US20070998141P | 09.10.2007 Original published format: US 998141 P | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719919 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2719919 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/53 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
F16F9/535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | Magnetorhelogischer Kolbenring und magnetorheolgischer Stoßdämpfer damit | [2014/16] | English: | Magnetorheological (MR) piston ring and MR damper having same | [2014/16] | French: | Segment de piston magnétorhéologique (MR) et amortisseur MR en disposant | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 15.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08165046.7 / EP2048409 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080165046) is 25.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2008 | AT | 17.07.2019 | CY | 17.07.2019 | CZ | 17.07.2019 | DK | 17.07.2019 | EE | 17.07.2019 | ES | 17.07.2019 | FI | 17.07.2019 | HR | 17.07.2019 | IT | 17.07.2019 | LT | 17.07.2019 | LV | 17.07.2019 | MC | 17.07.2019 | MT | 17.07.2019 | NL | 17.07.2019 | PL | 17.07.2019 | RO | 17.07.2019 | SE | 17.07.2019 | SI | 17.07.2019 | SK | 17.07.2019 | TR | 17.07.2019 | IE | 24.09.2019 | LU | 24.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | BG | 17.10.2019 | NO | 17.10.2019 | GR | 18.10.2019 | IS | 17.11.2019 | PT | 18.11.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.09.2008 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 24.09.2019 | ||
LU | 24.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 24.09.2019 | ||
LU | 24.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 24.09.2019 | ||
LU | 24.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IE | 24.09.2019 | ||
LU | 24.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LU | 24.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 17.07.2019 | |
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 17.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5816134 (TAKENAKA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * figures 9, 10, 11a-11c,12 * * page 7, column 13, line 13 - line 23 *; | [A]WO02066857 (GKN SINTER METALS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-6* figure 7 *; | [Y]US2002130001 (LISENKER ILYA [US]) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1355082 (DELTA TOOLING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 4a-4f *; | [A]US2006242959 (TANIZAKI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * figures 5a,5b * |