EP2769707 - Water-oil emulsions with multilayer pigment capsules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickhof, Susanne Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Kreuzstr. 23 41748 Viersen / DE | 02 /
Keßler-Becker, Daniela Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Unterstr. 81d 51371 Leverkusen / DE | [2014/35] | Application number, filing date | 14150915.8 | 13.01.2014 | [2014/35] | Priority number, date | DE201310202329 | 13.02.2013 Original published format: DE102013202329 | [2014/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2769707 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2769707 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2769707 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/36, A61K8/39, A61K8/37 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
A61K8/064 (EP);
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/361 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61Q1/02 (EP);
A61K2800/412 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2014/44] | A61K8/29, A61Q1/02, A61K8/06, A61K8/34, A61K8/02 | ||
Former IPC [2014/35] | A61K8/29, A61Q1/02, A61K8/06, A61K8/02, A61K8/36, A61K8/39 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | Wasser-in-Öl-Emulsionen mit mehrschichtigen Pigmentkapseln | [2014/35] | English: | Water-oil emulsions with multilayer pigment capsules | [2014/35] | French: | Émulsions eau dans huile avec capsules de pigments multicouches | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 19.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2015 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 07.07.2015 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 10.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2014 | AL | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | MT | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | IE | 13.01.2018 | LU | 13.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.01.2014 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 13.01.2014 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
IE | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009155322 (HARICHIAN BIJAN [US], et al) [X] 15 * Absätze 7, 23, 30, 58-60, 70, und Ansprüche 1-9 * [Y] 1-14; | [XY]US2009155321 (HARICHIAN BIJAN [US], et al) [X] 15 * das ganze Dokument, siehe insbesondere die Absätze 32-33, 59 und 76-77 * [Y] 1-14; | [Y]WO2004055119 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 9 - page 10 * * page 13 *; | [XPA]WO2013106999 (OREAL [FR], et al) [XP] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14; | [XPA]WO2013107000 (OREAL [FR], et al) [XP] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14; | [Y]EP1477159 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * examples 3,5,9,14 * |