EP2829896 - Temperature Compensation for Seismic Sensor and for Method of Acquisition of a Seismic Signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/05] | Temperature compensation for seismic sensor and for method of acquisition of a seismic signal | ||
[2017/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sercel, Inc. 17200 Park Row Houston, Texas 77084-5935 / US | [2015/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amerine, Marvin K. 110 Arrow Wood St. Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Tessier, Benoit Sebastien, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Descamps, Cécile Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes / FR | Application number, filing date | 14150975.2 | 13.01.2014 | [2015/05] | Priority number, date | US201313950747 | 25.07.2013 Original published format: US201313950747 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2829896 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2829896 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/18, G01V1/36, G01V1/16, G01V1/24, // G01D3/028 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
G01V1/182 (EP,US);
G01V1/24 (US);
G01V1/162 (EP,US);
G01V1/36 (EP,US);
G01D3/028 (EP,US);
G01V2210/27 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/05] | G01V1/18, G01V1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] |
Former [2015/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Temperaturkompensation für seismischen Sensor und für Verfahren zur Erfassung eines seismischen Signals | [2015/05] | English: | Temperature Compensation for Seismic Sensor and for Method of Acquisition of a Seismic Signal | [2017/32] | French: | Compensation de température pour capteur sismique et pour un procédé d'acquisition d'un signal sismique | [2015/05] |
Former [2015/05] | Temperature compensation for seismic sensor and for method of acquisition of a seismic signal | Examination procedure | 30.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 04.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4128010 (ASKE VERNON H) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 6; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP0110431 (REGT SPECIAL CABLE BV DE [NL]) [A] 1-17 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 4 ** page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 9; figure 3 *; | [A]EP2256520 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0031] , [ 0035] , [ 0056] , [ 0080] - paragraph [0089]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2428821 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0078] * |