EP2854183 - Back contact solar cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventec Solar Energy Corporation No. 349, Sec. 2, Renhe Road Daxi Township Taoyuan County 33547 / TW | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chien, Jung-Wu No. 349, Sec. 2, Renhe Rd. 33547 Daxi Township, Taoyuan County / TW | 02 /
Lin, Chia-Lung No. 349, Sec. 2, Renhe Rd. 33547 Daxi Township, Taoyuan County / TW | 03 /
Chen, Chuan Chi No. 349, Sec. 2, Renhe Rd. 33547 Daxi Township, Taoyuan County / TW | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2015/14] | Application number, filing date | 14151032.1 | 14.01.2014 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | TW20130217943 | 25.09.2013 Original published format: TW 102217943 | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2854183 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/061 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
H01L31/061 (EP);
H01L31/022433 (EP);
H01L31/022441 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2015/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rückseitenkontaktierte Solarzelle | [2015/14] | English: | Back contact solar cell | [2015/14] | French: | Cellule solaire à contact arrière | [2015/14] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 06.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011023956 (HARDER NILS-PETER [DE]) [X] 1-17 * figures 7,8 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] *; | [X]KR20130089051 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US2013087189 (GRAFF JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0035] *; | [X]US2008017243 (DE CEUSTER DENIS [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044] *; | [X]US2012171804 (MOSLEHI MEHRDAD M [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * figures 23-25 * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0107] *; | [X]EP2602834 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048] *; | [X]US2007295399 (CARLSON DAVID E [US]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0042] *; | [X]US6034321 (JENKINS PHILLIP P [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2012190183 (RICCI JUSTIN M [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * |