Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2754968 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2016 | B1 | EP2754968 | 16.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202013100172 | 14.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202013100172U | 25.01.2013 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202013100172 | 14.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2754968T | 24.10.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE202013100172 | 14.01.2013 |