Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
18.06.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.06.2015 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.10.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
03.10.2014 | Change - classification | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
22.07.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
20.06.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |