Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014196758 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013006334 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5751261B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2015 | B2 | JP2014138102 | 28.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013006334 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103943770 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013006334 | 17.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2757605 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2014 | A3 | EP2757605 | 23.07.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2013006334 | 17.01.2013 |