EP2757605 - Thermoelectric power generation unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamimura, Naoki c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken, 430-8650 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Kosuke c/o YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken, 430-8650 / JP | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14151262.4 | 15.01.2014 | [2014/30] | Priority number, date | JP20130006334 | 17.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013006334 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2757605 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2757605 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L35/32 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H10N10/17 (EP,US);
H10N10/13 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/30] | H01L35/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Thermoelektrische Stromerzeugungseinheit | [2014/30] | English: | Thermoelectric power generation unit | [2014/30] | French: | Unité de génération d'énergie thermoélectrique | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 07.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5367890 (DOKE MICHAEL J [US]); | [AD]JPH11312828 (AISIN SEIKI); | [A]EP1612870 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]); | [Y]EP1840981 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPH11312828 | JP2001144337 | JP2006234250 | JP2007110082 | JP3171039U |