EP2756819 - Interdental cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geefloss Corporation No. 52, Sec. 2, Ankang Rd. Xindian Dist. 23154 New Taipei City / TW | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ming-Hsiang Geefloss Corporation No. 52, Sec. 2, Ankang Rd., Xindian Dist 23154 New Taipei City / TW | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/30] | 01 /
Chen, Ming-Hsiang Geefloss Corporation No. 52, Sec. 2, Ankang Rd., Xindian Dist 23154 New Taipei City / TW | Representative(s) | BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | BSB Intellectual Property Law Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2014/45] | BSB Intellectual Property Law Am Markt 2 (Eingang Herrenstraße) 59302 Oelde / DE | ||
Former [2014/30] | Schütte, Hartmut BSB Anwaltskanzlei Am Markt 2 (Eingang Herrenstrasse) 59302 Oelde / DE | Application number, filing date | 14151315.0 | 15.01.2014 | [2014/30] | Priority number, date | TW20130101804 | 17.01.2013 Original published format: TW 102101804 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2756819 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2756819 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61C15/04 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
A61C15/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2014/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Zahnzwischenräumen | [2014/30] | English: | Interdental cleaning device | [2014/30] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage interdentaire | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 21.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2014 | AL | 30.08.2017 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | RS | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | IE | 15.01.2018 | LU | 15.01.2018 | MT | 15.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.01.2014 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2018 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
MT | 15.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 15.01.2014 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2018 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
MT | 15.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2018 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
MT | 15.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2018 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
MT | 15.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2018 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2018 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006266378 (LIU NICKOLAS [TW], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,2,6A * [A] 3-14; | [A]US5881744 (LO CHEN-WAN [TW]) [A] 1-14 * figures 3-6 * | by applicant | EP0339935 |